EP1733257 - CAMERA MODULE WITH FOCUSING LENS WITH ELECTROWETTING BASED MACRO SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/51] | FOCUSING LENS WITH ELECTROWETTING BASED MACRO SWITCH | ||
[2018/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRIKS, Bernardus, H., W. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KUIPER, Stein c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/19] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/51] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05709072.2 | 23.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005IB50991 | Priority number, date | EP20040101332 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101332 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005096030 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733257 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733257 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/14, G02B26/02 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G02B3/14 (EP,US);
G02B26/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL MIT FOKUSSIERUNGSLINSE MIT EINEM AUF ELEKTROBENETZUNG BASIERENDEN MAKROSCHALTER | [2018/46] | English: | CAMERA MODULE WITH FOCUSING LENS WITH ELECTROWETTING BASED MACRO SWITCH | [2018/46] | French: | MODULE DE CAMÉRA AVEC LENTILLE DE FOCALISATION MUNIE D'UN MACRO-COMMUTATEUR FONCTIONNANT PAR ELECTROMOUILLAGE | [2018/46] |
Former [2006/51] | FOKUSSIERUNGSLINSE MIT EINEM AUF ELEKTROBENETZUNG BASIERENDEN MAKROSCHALTER | ||
Former [2006/51] | FOCUSING LENS WITH ELECTROWETTING BASED MACRO SWITCH | ||
Former [2006/51] | LENTILLE DE FOCALISATION MUNIE D'UN MACRO-COMMUTATEUR FONCTIONNANT PAR ELECTROMOUILLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2018 | 16.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2005 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.03.2005 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001017985 (TSUBOI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0184]; figure 23 *; | [Y]US2002090168 (BARTELS FRANK [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6288846 (STONER JR JOHN O [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 44; figures 2-5 *; | [Y]US2003012483 (TICKNOR ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0114]; figure 4 *; | [DA]WO03069380 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-10; | [PX]WO2004027490 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 6, line 28 - page 10, line 4; figures 1-5 * | Examination | WO2005096029 | WO2005096032 | WO2005069054 |