EP1722291 - CHARACTER STRING DISPLAY SYSTEM, CHARACTER STRING DISPLAY METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [2008/14] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 6-10-1 Roppongi Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6114 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Mikio, c/o Konami Digital Ent. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-6114 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGISHI, Takao, c/oKonami Digital Ent. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-6114 / JP | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
SAITO, Mikio, c/o Konami Digital Ent. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1066114 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAGISHI, Takao, c/oKonami Digital Ent. Co., Ltd. 6-10-1, Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1066114 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05709418.7 | 27.01.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005JP01144 | Priority number, date | JP20040063158 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004063158 | [2006/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085982 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722291 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722291 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06F3/14, G09G5/00, G09G5/22 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/01 (EP,US);
G01R11/09 (KR);
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/45 (EP);
G01R11/16 (KR);
G09G5/00 (EP,US);
A63F2300/303 (EP,US);
A63F2300/63 (EP,US);
A63F2300/807 (EP,US);
G09G2340/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEICHENKETTEN-ANZEIGESYSTEM, ZEICHENKETTEN-ANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2006/46] | English: | CHARACTER STRING DISPLAY SYSTEM, CHARACTER STRING DISPLAY METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2006/46] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE DE CHAINE DE CARACTERES, PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE CHAINE DE CARACTERES ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2006 | Translation filed | 28.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 12.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9806082 (WALKER RANDALL C [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10* page 27, line 3 - line 18; figures 1,10 *; | [X]US6130968 (MCIAN PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 2, line 60 - line 65 * * column 6, line 8 - line 24 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 61; figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO0237256 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 11, line 17 - page 17, line 17 * * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 19; figures 1-3,7,8 * | International search | [Y]JP2001272967 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2003144758 (KONAMI COMP ENTERTAINMENT); | [Y]US2004036714 (BLAKELY JASON Y [US], et al) |