EP1710225 - CARBONYL COMPOUND CONTAINING LONG-CHAIN BRANCHED ALKYL GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Haruhito 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba 2990193 / JP | 02 /
KASHIWAMURA, Takashi 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba 2990193 / JP | 03 /
OKAMOTO, Takuji 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba 2990193 / JP | 04 /
YOKOTA, Kiyohiko 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba 2990193 / JP | [2006/49] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
SATO, Haruhito 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2990193 / JP | ||
02 /
KASHIWAMURA, Takashi 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2990193 / JP | |||
03 /
OKAMOTO, Takuji 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2990193 / JP | |||
04 /
YOKOTA, Kiyohiko 1-1, Anesakikaigan, Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2990193 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05709449.2 | 28.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005JP01223 | Priority number, date | JP20040020493 | 28.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004020493 | [2006/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077876 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710225 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/02, C07C53/126, C07C69/24, C10M105/20, C10M105/24, C10M105/34, C10M105/38, C10M129/24, C10M129/40, C10M129/70, C10M129/74, A61K8/18 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C07C17/16 (EP,US);
C07C45/004 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C47/02 (EP,US);
C07C53/126 (EP,US);
C07C69/24 (EP,US);
C10M129/24 (EP,US);
C10M129/40 (EP,US);
C10M129/70 (EP,US);
C10M129/74 (EP,US);
C10M2207/08 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/16, C07C19/075 (EP,US);
C07C45/004, C07C47/02 (US,EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBONYLVERBINDUNG MIT LANGKETTIGER, VERZWEIGTER ALKYLGRUPPE | [2006/41] | English: | CARBONYL COMPOUND CONTAINING LONG-CHAIN BRANCHED ALKYL GROUP | [2006/41] | French: | COMPOSE CARBONYLE CONTENANT UN GROUPE ALKYLE RAMIFIE LONGUE CHAINE | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2006 | Translation filed | 24.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0444208 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,11* page 9 - page 10 *; | [A]WO9402111 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,9 * page 4 - page 5; example 1; table 1, table 2; claim 1 *; | [X] - POLGAR, N. ET AL, "Long-chain acids containing a quaternary C atom. II", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1944:10045, URL: STN, XP002461228 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS57200325 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [X]JPH08127963 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [X]JPH1161646 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [X]US5488121 (O'LENICK JR ANTHONY J [US]); | [X]GB1239394 ; | [X]JPH08183724 (KAO CORP); | [X]US5639791 (O'LENICK JR ANTHONY J [US]); | [Y] - KARINEN R.S. ET AL, "Catalytic synthesis of a novel tertiary ether 3-methoxy-3-methylheptane, from 1-butene.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL., (2000), vol. 152, no. 1-2, pages 253 - 255, XP008092063 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1169(99)00409-4 | [Y] - SAKURAI T. ET AL, "Shinpan Junkatsu no Butsuri Kagaku.", SAIWA SHOBO., (1978), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 201 - 205, XP008091904 | [Y] - CSJ. THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN., Jikken Kagaru Koza 21 Yuri Kagaku III., MARUZEN CO. LTD., (1991), XP008099541 | Examination | US4460510 | - POLGAR N ET AL, "LONG-CHAIN ACIDS CONTAINING A QUATERNARY CARBON ATOM. PART II", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19430101), ISSN 0002-7863, pages 615 - 619, XP009044057 |