EP1714654 - DRUG FOR INHIBITING VASCULAR INTIMAL HYPERPLASIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD 24-1 Takada 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIYAMA, Hiroshi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama 3490218 / JP | 02 /
SHUDO, Norimasa, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind., Ltd. 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama 3490218 / JP | 03 /
TSURUZOE, Nobutomo, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama, Saitama 3490218 / JP | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05709638.0 | 02.02.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005JP01518 | Priority number, date | JP20040032551 | 09.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004032551 | [2006/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005074938 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714654 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/501, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, C07D401/12 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/501 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | A61K31/501, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, // C07D401/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | 29.06.2006 | BA | 29.06.2006 | HR | 29.06.2006 | LV | 29.06.2006 | MK | 29.06.2006 | YU | 29.06.2006 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR HEMMUNG VON VASKULÄRER INTIMAHYPERPLASIE | [2006/43] | English: | DRUG FOR INHIBITING VASCULAR INTIMAL HYPERPLASIA | [2006/43] | French: | MEDICAMENT DESTINE A INHIBER L HYPERPLASIE INTIME VASCULAIRE | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2006 | Translation filed | 29.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 02.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0482208 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * table 1 * * page 1, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP0742211 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 1 - paragraph 1 * * table I *; | [A]WO9712869 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* page 1, paragraphs 2-4 *; | [X]EP1157694 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * * claims 1-10 * | International search | [Y]WO9116314 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]JPH07252237 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [Y]JPH09157258 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO0033845 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al); | [Y] - UEHARA K. ET AL, "Phosphodiesterase 3 Sogaizai no Kodomyaku Koka Sayo.", THE CELL., (1998), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 197 - 200, XP002992144 | [Y] - HACHISU M. ET AL, "Sentakuteki Phosphodiesterase III Sogaizai Amrinone ni yoru Rat Keidomyaku Shinsei Naimaku Hiko Yokusei Sayo.", FOLIA PHARMACOL.JPN., (1998), vol. 122, page 274, XP002992145 | [Y] - KIMURA Y. ET AL, "Summary of Cilostazol, a PDE III Inhibitor.", JPN.J.PHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 85, no. 1, pages S36 - 1, XP002992146 |