EP1731218 - METHOD FOR DECOMPOSING POLYCARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAHARA, Mai, Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | 02 /
HIRATA, Masumi, Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | 03 /
BAN, Tetsuo, Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | 04 /
SAWAKI, Toru, Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05710186.7 | 08.02.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP02184 | Priority number, date | JP20040034596 | 12.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004034596 | JP20040094672 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004094672 | [2006/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077515 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731218 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/00, B01D9/02, C07C37/50, C08G64/30, C08J11/14 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
C08J11/14 (EP,US);
C08J11/22 (KR);
B01J3/008 (EP,US);
C07C37/0555 (EP,US);
C08G64/42 (KR);
C08J11/18 (KR);
C08J2369/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/54 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/0555, C07C39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSETZUNG VON POLYCARBONAT | [2006/50] | English: | METHOD FOR DECOMPOSING POLYCARBONATE | [2006/50] | French: | PROC D POUR D COMPOSER DU POLYCARBONATE | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2006 | Translation filed | 07.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0549259 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 55; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0581074 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 8 * abstract ** example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0854165 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - line 34 * * page 4, line 14 - line 18; claim - *; | [X]US2002006367 (MATSUBARA WATARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; claim - *; | [X] - TAGAYA H ET AL, "Decomposition of polycarbonate in subcritical and supercritical water", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, BARKING, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0141-3910(98)00204-3, (19990501), vol. 64, no. 2, ISSN 0141-3910, pages 289 - 292, XP004294663 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-3910(98)00204-3 | [X] - RÉGIS CINIER, JEAN GUILMENT, "Quantative analysis of resorcinol in aqueous solution by near-infrared spectroscopy", VIBRATIONAL SPECTROSCOPY, (1996), vol. 11, pages 51 - 59, XP002606067 [X] 8 * abstract * * page 52, column l, paragraph 3 * * table 1 * | International search | [X]JPH11286572 (TOHOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [X]JP2000053800 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND, et al) |