EP1720380 - SWITCH LIGHTING EL SHEET AND LIGHTING SWITCH AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd. 8, Shinsugita-cho Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP | For all designated states Sekonic Corporation 24-14, Ooizumi-Gakuen-cho 7-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 1788686 / JP | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Mitsuo, @TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO., LTD. 8, Shinsugita-cho Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2358522 / JP | 02 /
SHIGENOBU, Koji, @TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO., LTD. 8, Shinsugita-cho Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2358522 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Shunichi, @HAKODATE SEKONIC INC. 3-91, Suzuranoka-cho Hakodate-shi, Hokkaido 0420958 / JP | [2016/44] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Mitsuo, TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO., LTD. 8, Shinsugita-cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2358522 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIGENOBU, Koji, TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO., LTD. 8, Shinsugita-cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2358522 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMADA, Shunichi, HAKODATE SEKONIC INC. 3-91, Suzuranoka-cho Hakodate-shi, Hokkaido 0420958 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05710649.4 | 24.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005JP02998 | Priority number, date | JP20040052371 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004052371 | [2006/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084079 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720380 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720380 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/04, H05B33/14, H05B33/28, H01H13/02, H01H13/70 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H05B33/04 (KR);
H01H13/83 (EP,US);
H01H2209/002 (EP,US);
H01H2209/016 (EP,US);
H01H2209/06 (EP,US);
H01H2209/082 (EP,US);
H01H2219/018 (EP,US);
H01H2219/046 (EP,US);
H01H2219/052 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTERBELEUCHTUNGS-EL-BLATT UND BELEUCHTUNGSSCHALTER UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2006/45] | English: | SWITCH LIGHTING EL SHEET AND LIGHTING SWITCH AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS USING IT | [2006/45] | French: | FEUILLE EL D'ECLAIRAGE D'INTERRUPTEUR ET INTER RUPTEUR D'ECLAIRAGE ET APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE UTILISANT CELLE-CI | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2006 | Translation filed | 31.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 09.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2005 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | GB | 24.02.2017 | IE | 24.02.2017 | LU | 24.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.02.2005 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.02.2005 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09325702 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0005] *; | [I]EP0818793 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * figures 2,5 ** example 3 *; | [I]JPH11250758 (KAWAGUCHIKO SEIMITSU KK) [I] 1-15 * figures 1,2,6 *; | [I]JPH11260183 (FUJIKURA LTD) [I] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP1035557 (SEIKO PRECISION KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] *; | [I]JP2000340060 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * figures 2,3,5 * * paragraph [0016] *; | [I]US2002030987 (SAITO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0014] * | International search | [X]JP2002056737 (SEIKO PRECISION KK); | [X]JPH0820772 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JPH0670195U ; | [Y]JP2003201474 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2001185358 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]JP2002173676 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) | Examination | WO02097837 |