EP1615327 - DRIVE CONTROLLING DEVICE, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, DRIVE CONTROLLING METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, DRIVE CONTROLLING PROGRAM FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Takashi, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 3928502 / JP | 02 /
KITAHARA, Joji, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 3928502 / JP | 03 /
OKEYA, Makoto, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa3- chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 3928502 / JP | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 05710731.0 | 25.02.2005 | [2006/02] | WO2005JP03181 | Priority number, date | JP20040051182 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004051182 | [2006/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005083873 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615327 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615327 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02N2/06, H02N2/00, H01L41/04 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G04C3/12 (EP,US);
H02N2/101 (US);
G04C10/00 (EP,US);
H02N2/004 (EP,US);
H02N2/142 (EP,US);
H02N2/103 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | H02N2/00, G04C3/00, G04C3/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/22] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSEINRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHER APPARAT, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN ELEKTRONISCHEN APPARAT, STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHEN APPARAT, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/02] | English: | DRIVE CONTROLLING DEVICE, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, DRIVE CONTROLLING METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, DRIVE CONTROLLING PROGRAM FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D' EXCITATION, APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE, METHODE DE COMMANDE D'EXCITATION POUR APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'EXCITATION POUR APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2005 | Translation filed | 24.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2756712 (COPAL CO LTD); | [A]US4214827 (IMURA TOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0232906 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0432971 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]); | [X]US6316862 (NAKATA MASAO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH06237582 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |