EP1828004 - BIODEGRADABLE STARCH BOWL AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Youl Chon Chemical Co. Ltd. 370-1 Sindaebang-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-709 / KR | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Heon Moo, @Jugong Apt. 338-508, @552 Cheolsan- dong, Kwangmyeong-si Kyeonggi-do 423-733 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sung-Arn, @Jugong, Apt. 320-303 Weolpi-dong, Sangrok-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 425-798 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kang-Soo, @Jugong Greenvill Apt. 908-503, @765 Gojan 1-dong, Danwon-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 425-798 / KR | 04 /
AN, Jun-Seung, @Hyundae 1-cha Apt 3-206, @661-3 Gojan 1-dong, Danwon-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 425-806 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Young-Hee, @Woosung Apt 5-505 Bono 3-dong, Sangrok-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 426-732 / KR | [2015/14] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
KIM, Heon Moo, Jugong Apt. 338-508, 552 Cheolsan- dong, Kwangmyeong-si Kyeonggi-do 423-733 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Sung-Arn, Jugong, Apt. 320-303 Weolpi-dong, Sangrok-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 425-798 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Kang-Soo, Jugong Greenvill Apt. 908-503, 765 Gojan 1-dong, Danwon-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 425-798 / KR | |||
04 /
AN, Jun-Seung, Hyundae 1-cha Apt 3-206, 661-3 Gojan 1-dong, Danwon-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 425-806 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Young-Hee, Woosung Apt 5-505 Bono 3-dong, Sangrok-gu, Ansan-si Kyeonggi-do 426-732 / KR | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2015/14] |
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/36] | Breese, Pierre BREDEMA 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05710829.2 | 26.01.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005KR00217 | Priority number, date | KR20040053629 | 09.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004053629 | [2007/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006761 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828004 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828004 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/46, B29C51/16 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
B65D65/46 (KR);
B29C51/162 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C2791/007 (EP,US);
B29K2003/00 (EP,US);
Y02A40/90 (EP,US);
Y02W90/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | B65D65/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE STÄRKESCHALE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/36] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE STARCH BOWL AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [2007/36] | French: | BOL EN AMIDON BIODEGRADABLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2006 | Translation filed | 18.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2005 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 26.01.2005 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.01.2005 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4982872 (AVERY DONALD J [US]); | [A]JPH11171238 (TOMEN CORP); | [A]JP2000169611 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [Y]EP1321289 (NISSEI KK [JP]); | [Y]KR20040053644 (YULCHON CHEMICAL CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2001103845 (SUZUKI SOGYO KK); | [A]KR20040053644 (YULCHON CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [AP]KR200366379Y (YOUL CHON CHEMICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) | by applicant | JPH0797545 | EP1321289 |