EP1723411 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CHARACTERIZATION OF INTERACTIONS BETWEEN DIFFERENT SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ridgeview Instruments AB Skillsta 4 740 20 Vänge / SE | For all designated states Andersson, Karl Skillsta 4 740 20 Vänge / SE | [2013/32] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Ridgeview Instruments AB Ulleråkersvägen 62 756 43 Uppsala / SE | ||
For all designated states Andersson, Karl Ulleråkersvägen 62 756 43 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Karl Skillsta 4 740 20 VAENGE / SE | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/16] | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Karl Ulleråkersvägen 62 756 43 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Karl Ullerakersvägen 62 756 43 Uppsala / SE | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/32] | Lindgren, Anders BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Lindgren, Anders Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05711063.7 | 16.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005SE00203 | Priority number, date | SE20040000403 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: SE 0400403 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080967 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723411 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723411 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/53 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
B01L3/508 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON WECHSELWIRKUNGEN ZWISCHEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN SPEZIES | [2006/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CHARACTERIZATION OF INTERACTIONS BETWEEN DIFFERENT SPECIES | [2006/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA CARACTERISATION DES INTERACTIONS ENTRE DIFFERENTES ESPECES | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2012 | 09.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2005 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | IE | 16.02.2014 | LU | 16.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.02.2005 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
PT | 09.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4479720 (MOCHIDA EI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO0240634 (GENETAG TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [X]US2003224457 (HURT SUSAN NEWCOMB [US], et al); | [A]US2004023293 (KREIMER DAVID I [US], et al) | Examination | US2002081569 |