EP1723682 - THIN FILM SOLAR CELL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solibro Research AB Vallvägen 5 756 51 Uppsala / SE | [2009/44] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Solibro AB Ultuna 756 51 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALMSTRÖM, Jonas Ringgatan 12B S-752 17 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
STOLT, Lars Vreta Ekväg 2 S-755 91 Uppsala / SE | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/31] | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Franks, Barry Gerard BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05711173.4 | 03.03.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005SE00321 | Priority number, date | SE20040000631 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: SE 0400631 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088731 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723682 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723682 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/032, H01L31/052 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H01L31/0322 (EP,US);
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/056 (EP,US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US);
Y02E10/541 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | H01L31/0248, H01L31/042, H01L31/0272 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | DÜNNFILM-SOLARZELLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/47] | English: | THIN FILM SOLAR CELL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2006/47] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE A COUCHE MINCE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2012 | 07.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2007 | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2005 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | IE | 03.03.2014 | LU | 03.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.03.2005 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6288325 (JANSEN KAI W [US], et al); | [A]WO03007386 (MIDWEST RESEARCH INST [US], et al); | [AP]WO2004100250 (FORSKARPATENT I UPPSALA AB [SE], et al); | [AP]US2004063320 (HOLLARS DENNIS R [US]); | [AP]WO2004032189 (RAYCOM TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) | Examination | - "Email dated 9.08.2007 from Prof. Dr. Werner to the European Patent Office" | - "Final technical report: Production of large-area CIS-based modules, project N° NNE5-2000-0398, Contract N° ENK5-CT-2000-00331", (20040228), XP055014151 | - ORGASSA K ET AL, "Alternative back contact materials for thin film Cu(In,Ga)Se2 solar cells", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20030501), vol. 431-432, doi:10.1016/S0040-6090(03)00257-8, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 387 - 391, XP004428673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(03)00257-8 |