EP1718341 - ARTICLES COMPRISING MAGNETIC MATERIAL AND BIOACTIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnis Biosciences, Inc. 5764 Shellmound Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRY, Stephen, E. 8004 Shellnut Road Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 02 /
SUNDERLAND, Christopher, J. 433 Brookside Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 03 /
GOODWIN, Andrew, A. 1780 Burkhart Avenue San Leandro, CA 94579 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
BARRY, Stephen, E. 214 Livorna Heights Road Alamo, CA 94507 / US | ||
02 /
SUNDERLAND, Christopher, J. 100 Emery Bay Drive Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | |||
03 /
GOODWIN, Andrew, A. 1758 Dayton Avenue San Leandro, CA 94579 / US | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05711690.7 | 20.01.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US01755 | Priority number, date | US20040537500P | 20.01.2004 Original published format: US 537500 P | US20040616390P | 06.10.2004 Original published format: US 616390 P | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005070471 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718341 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/18 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
A61K47/58 (EP);
A61K47/60 (EP);
A61K47/61 (EP);
A61K47/6923 (EP);
A61K47/6929 (EP);
A61K49/1839 (EP);
A61K49/186 (EP);
A61K49/1863 (EP);
A61K49/1866 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTIKEL MIT EINEM MAGNETISCHEN MATERIAL UND BIOAKTIVEN MITTELN | [2006/45] | English: | ARTICLES COMPRISING MAGNETIC MATERIAL AND BIOACTIVE AGENTS | [2006/45] | French: | ARTICLES COMPRENANT UN MATERIAU MAGNETIQUE ET DES AGENTS BIOACTIFS | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2008 | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2009 | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5514379 (WEISSLEDER ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,7-13,15-17 * example 9 *; | [X]US6423296 (GUNTHER WOLFGANG ET AL) [X] 1-5,7-13,15-17 * column 16 *; | [X]US5427767 (KRESSE ET AL) [X] 14 * column 5, line 10 - column 8, line 55 *; | [X]WO03005029 (GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALBERTA; XU, ZHENGHE; GU, YUNLI) [X] 1-5,7-17 * page 14 - page 17 *; | [Y]WO03101425 (ALINIS BIOSCIENCES, INC; BARRY, STEPHEN, E; GOODWIN, ANDREW, A; DECOR,) [Y] 1-17 * examples 1-39 *; | [Y]FR2841156 (BIO MERIEUX) [Y] 1-17 * page 16; claims 1-27 *; | [PX]US2004115433 (ELAISSARI ABDELHAMID ET AL) [PX] 1-5,7-13,15-17 * example 9 *; | [E]US6866838 (MONDAIN-MONVAL OLIVIER ET AL) [E] 1-5,7-13,15-17 * example 4; claims 1-18 *; | [E]WO2005065724 (ALNIS BIOSCIENCES, INC; BARRY, STEPHEN, E; STEIERT, MATTHIAS; GOODWIN,) [E] 1-17 * claims 1-19 *; | [PA] - LANZA G M ET AL, "Magnetic resonance molecular imaging with nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR CARDIOLOGY, MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (200411), vol. 11, no. 6, ISSN 1071-3581, pages 733 - 743, XP004673066 [PA] 1-13,15-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nuclcard.2004.09.002 |