EP1763959 - INTERLEAVER MODE DETECTION IN A DIGITAL VIDEO RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKMAN, Ivonete 11388 Royal Court Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
LIU, Weixiao 1153 Rustic Willow Lane Charlottesville, Virginia 22911 / US | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
MARKMAN, Ivonete 11388 Royal Court Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Weixiao 9353 D College Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2014/11] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/38] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/12] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05711932.3 | 24.01.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005US02216 | Priority number, date | US20040570603P | 13.05.2004 Original published format: US 570603 P | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005115010 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763959 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763959 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/44, H04N19/89 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | H04N7/64, H04N7/26, H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/21] |
Former [2007/34] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DETEKTION DES INTERLEAVER MODUS IN EINEM DIGITALEN VIDEOEMPFÄNGER | [2016/35] | English: | INTERLEAVER MODE DETECTION IN A DIGITAL VIDEO RECEIVER | [2007/12] | French: | DETECTION DE MODE D'ENTRELACEUR DANS UN RECEPTEUR VIDEO NUMERIQUE | [2007/12] |
Former [2007/12] | VERSCHACHTLER-MODUSDETEKTION IN EINEM DIGITALEN VIDEOEMPFÄNGER | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 14.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.01.2018 | [2018/50] | Cited in | International search | [IY]US5757416 (BIRCH CHRISTOPHER H [CA], et al) [I] 1,5-7,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - line 43 * * column 4, line 9 - line 11 * * column 5, line 57 - line 60 * * column 7, line 4 - line 25 * * column 7, line 45 - line 58 * * column 8, line 40 - line 45 * * column 8, line 60 - line 67 * * column 9, line 62 * * column 19, line 17 - line 27 * * claim 1 * * figures 2A,2C,2D,4,6C * [Y] 2-4,8-12,14-17; | [A]US6707859 (KINNUNEN PASI [FI], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 14 * * column 1, line 32 - line 45 * * column 2, line 29 - line 40 * * column 7, line 39 - line 52 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1061746 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 5,6,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0025] * * figure 1 *; | [Y] - "Digital Video Transmission Standard for Cable Television", DOCUMENT SOCIETY OF CABLE TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERS, (200007), pages 1 - 24, XP002260516 [Y] 2-4,8-12,14-17 * page 6, line 13 - line 18 * * page 12, line 4 - line 10 * * page 12; table 1 * * page 13; table 2 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 3 * * page 13; figure 9 * * page 14; figure 10 * | [A] - KECK W, "A METHOD FOR ROBUST DECODING OF ERRONEOUS MPEG-2 VIDEO BITSTREAMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199608), vol. 42, no. 3, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 411 - 421, XP000638521 [A] 5,6,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.536138 | [A] - LEVENSHTEIN V I, "Efficient reconstruction of sequences", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY IEEE USA, (200101), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 2 - 22, XP002326857 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.904499 |