EP1740135 - ABSORBENT GARMENT CHARACTERISTICS FOR DROOP ELIMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2010/18] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DATTA, Paul, Joseph N2005 Mayflower Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | 02 /
HANCOCK-COOKE, Catherine, Marquerite 216 Bosworth Court Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/02] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05712448.9 | 26.01.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005US03012 | Priority number, date | US20040837251 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 837251 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005110313 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740135 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740135 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1740135 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
A61F13/15203 (EP,US);
A61F13/496 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/49 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/15365 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2022/18] |
Former [2007/21] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EIGENSCHAFTEN SAUGFÄHIGER KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKE ZUR ELIMINIERUNG VON REGELDIFFERENZ | [2007/02] | English: | ABSORBENT GARMENT CHARACTERISTICS FOR DROOP ELIMINATION | [2007/02] | French: | CHARACTÉRISTIQUES DE VÊTEMENTS ABSORBANTS POUR ÉLIMINATION DE L'AFFAISSEMENT | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 01.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2011
16.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Procter & Gamble, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP, et al, et al Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 02
04.02.2011
15.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH, et al, et al Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2011
16.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Procter & Gamble, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US Opponent's representative Elkington & Fife LLP, et al, et al Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
04.02.2011
15.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al, et al Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2018/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2011
16.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Procter & Gamble, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US Opponent's representative Anderson, James Edward George, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
04.02.2011
15.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al, et al Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2011
Procter & Gamble, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US Opponent's representative Anderson, James Edward George, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
04.02.2011
Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Möller, Christoph, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 DE-80335 München / DE | 17.03.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.01.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.03.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.08.2015 | Appeal received No. T1592/15 | 05.10.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.05.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 07.08.2015 | Appeal received No. T1592/15 | 30.09.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.05.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 17.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9514453 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,9,11 * figures 1,15; tables IV,V *; | [X]WO0232361 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON IND COM [BR], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 9, lines 4-9; figure 1 *; | [X]US2002177829 (FELL DAVID ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-11* paragraphs [0179] , [0180] , [0168] , [0182] , [0183] , [0226]; figures 1a,10 * | Opposition | US4050462 | EP0398992 | WO9621412 | JPH1057414 | WO0113852 | WO0232361 | US2002165517 | US2002177829 | WO03007863 | - ASTM D 2433-93 |