EP1744791 - CROSSLINKABLE HYDROPHILIC MATERIALS FROM REACTIVE OLIGOMERS HAVING PENDENT UNSATURATED GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWANDOWSKI, Kevin, M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
FANSLER, Duane, D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
WENDLAND, Michael, S. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
HEILMANN, Steven, M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
GADDAM, Babu, N. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05712643.5 | 03.02.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005US03271 | Priority number, date | US20040792238 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: US 792238 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005092402 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744791 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744791 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/16, A61L15/22, C08G65/30, C08F290/06, C08F290/14 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G02B1/043 (EP,US);
A61L15/24 (EP,US);
A61L15/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/24, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61L15/26, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
G02B1/043, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
G02B1/043, C08L71/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERNETZBARE HYDROPHILE MATERIALIEN AUS REAKTIVEN OLIGOMEREN MIT ANHÄNGENDEN UNGESÄTTIGTEN GRUPPEN | [2007/04] | English: | CROSSLINKABLE HYDROPHILIC MATERIALS FROM REACTIVE OLIGOMERS HAVING PENDENT UNSATURATED GROUPS | [2007/04] | French: | MATERIAUX HYDROPHILES RETICULABLES D'OLIGOMERES REACTIFS POSSEDANT DES GROUPES INSATURES PENDANTS | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | BE | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | CZ | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | EE | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | IT | 08.07.2009 | LT | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | PL | 08.07.2009 | RO | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | SI | 08.07.2009 | SK | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | BG | 08.10.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | ES | 19.10.2009 | IS | 08.11.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | HU | 09.01.2010 | IE | 03.02.2010 | LU | 03.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
LU | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | SI | 08.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9837441 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-31 * claim 8 ** examples 1-9 *; | [X]WO03086493 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-31 * claims 3,17 * * tables 3-5 * * example 34 *; | [E]WO2005035607 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [E] 1-31 * claim 20 * * examples 1-83 * |