EP1725989 - REGISTER BASED QUEUING FOR TEXTURE REQUESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NVIDIA Corporation 2701 San Tomas Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDHOLM, John, Erik 20682 Rice Court Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
NICKOLLS, John, R. 390 Cherry Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
MOY, Simon, S. 288 Sunkist Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
COON, Brett, W. 5038 Newgate Court San Jose, CA 95138 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nußbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05713143.5 | 09.02.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005US03999 | Priority number, date | US20040789735 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: US 789735 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005093665 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725989 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725989 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G09G5/363 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | 27.09.2006 | BA | 27.09.2006 | HR | 27.09.2006 | LV | 27.09.2006 | MK | 27.09.2006 | YU | 27.09.2006 | Title | German: | REGISTER-WARTESCHLANGENBILDUNG FÜR STRUKTURANFORDERUNGEN | [2006/48] | English: | REGISTER BASED QUEUING FOR TEXTURE REQUESTS | [2006/48] | French: | MISE EN FILE D'ATTENTE A BASE DE REGISTRE POUR DEMANDES DE TEXTURE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2005 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5034887 (YASUI IKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]US5301295 (LEARY KEVIN W [US], et al) [A] 1-28* abstract *; | [X]WO9611443 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 4; claims 11-15 *; | [A]US5706466 (DOCKSER KENNETH A [US]) [A] 1-28 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2002184465 (GROSBACH JAMES H [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [X]US2003187911 (ABD-EL-MALEK MICHAEL [CA], et al) [X] 1-28 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X] - ALEXANDER MULLER, "Der Stack Frame", (2003), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.a-m-i.de/tips/stack/stack.php, (20050520), XP002328991 [X] 1-28 * the whole document * |