EP1756785 - INTELLIGENT MESSAGE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caretouch Communications, Inc. 1011 Walnut Street, Suite 400 Boulder CO 80302 / US | For all designated states McCulloch, William R. 3321 Copper Avenue Broomfield CO 80020 / US | For all designated states Lund, Craig J. 695 West Sagebrush Drive Louisville CO 80027 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCULLOCH, William, R. 3321 Copper Avenue Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | 02 /
LUND, Craig, J. 695 West Sagebrush Drive Louisville, CO 80027 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St Ives Cambridge PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05713197.1 | 10.02.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US04093 | Priority number, date | US20040547115P | 24.02.2004 Original published format: US 547115 P | US20040547264P | 24.02.2004 Original published format: US 547264 P | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005081802 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1756785 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B23/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06F40/131 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES ZUSTELLSYSTEM FÜR NACHRICHTEN | [2007/09] | English: | INTELLIGENT MESSAGE DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2007/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN MESSAGE INTELLIGENT | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 18.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6260059 (UENO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2001032248 (KRAFCHIN RICHARD H [US]); | [A]US2001032278 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [A]US2002046062 (KAMEDA TOSHITADA [JP]) |