EP1850793 - ASPHERIC LENSES AND LENS FAMILY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, NY 14604-2701 / US | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMANN, Griffith, E. 88 Rock Creek Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/51] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05713306.8 | 11.02.2005 | [2007/45] | WO2005US04282 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006088440 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850793 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1850793 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/164 (EP,US);
A61F2/1613 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ASPHÄRISCHE LINSEN UND LINSENFAMILIE | [2007/45] | English: | ASPHERIC LENSES AND LENS FAMILY | [2007/45] | French: | LENTILLES ASPHERIQUES ET GAMME DE LENTILLES | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 05.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2005 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | IE | 11.02.2019 | LU | 11.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | BG | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004090611 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-17,19,20* claims 1,3,6,8,21 * |