EP1755789 - ELECTROSTATIC SPRAY ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPRAYING SYSTEMS CO. North Avenue at Schmale Road, P.O. Box 7900 Wheaton Illinois 60189-7900 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULJONO, Eric Budi 3 Silversti Circle Derry, NH 03039 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2015/28] |
Former [2007/09] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05713313.4 | 11.02.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US04289 | Priority number, date | US20040544269P | 12.02.2004 Original published format: US 544269 P | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005079281 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1755789 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755789 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/20, B05B5/035, B05B5/043, B05B5/053, F16N7/34 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
B05B1/202 (EP,US);
B05B5/035 (EP,US);
B05B5/043 (EP,US);
B05B5/0533 (EP,US);
B05B1/20 (EP,US);
F16N7/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | B05B5/00, F23D11/32 | ||
Former IPC [2007/09] | B05B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHE SPRAY-BAUGRUPPE | [2007/09] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC SPRAY ASSEMBLY | [2007/09] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE PULVERISATION ELECTROSTATIQUE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 24.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2005 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | LU | 11.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 11.02.2005 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.02.2005 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO8810152 (RANSBURG CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,5,10 * page 5, line 5 - line 30; figures 2-4 * [Y] 3,6 [I] 2,9; | [IY]GB1569707 (ICI LTD) [I] 3-5,7-10 * page 4, line 71 - page 6, line 9; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,6; | [Y]US4703891 (JACKSON ALISTAIR J [GB], et al) [Y] 6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4703891 (JACKSON ALISTAIR J [GB], et al); | [A]US6003794 (HARTMAN WILLIAM J [US], et al) |