EP1736027 - OPTIMUM DRIVER SPACING FOR A LINE ARRAY WITH A MINIMUM NUMBER OF RADIATING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altec Lansing Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 277 Route 6 and 209 Milford, PA 18337 / US | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGHES, Charles 2130 Shadwell Court Gastonia, NC 28056 / US | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
HUGHES, Charles 106 Field Place Milford, PA 18337 / US | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Williamson, Brian, et al OLSWANG 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05713509.7 | 11.02.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005US04629 | Priority number, date | US20040796199 | 10.03.2004 Original published format: US 796199 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091809 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736027 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/02, H04R9/06, H04R1/40, H04R3/12 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H04R3/12 (EP,US);
H04R1/403 (EP,US);
H04R2201/405 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | H04R1/02, H04R9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMALER DRIVERABSTAND FÜR EIN LINE-ARRAY MIT EINER MINIMALEN ANZAHL VON STRAHLENDEN ELEMENTEN | [2006/52] | English: | OPTIMUM DRIVER SPACING FOR A LINE ARRAY WITH A MINIMUM NUMBER OF RADIATING ELEMENTS | [2006/52] | French: | ECARTEMENT OPTIMUM DE CIRCUITS D'ATTAQUE POUR UN RESEAU LINEAIRE PRESENTANT UN NOMBRE MINIMUM D'ELEMENTS RAYONNANTS | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 14.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02239798 (TOA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,8,13 * abstract *; | [X]US4991687 (OYABA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-16,18 * column 2, lines 45-66; figure 1 *; | [A] - GOODWIN M M ET AL, "Constant beamwidth beamforming", PLENARY, SPECIAL, AUDIO, UNDERWATER ACOUSTICS, VLSI, NEURAL NETWORKS. MINNEAPOLIS, APR. 27 - 30, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930427), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-0946-3, pages 169 - 172, XP010110323 [A] 1-18 * page 169 - page 179 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319082 | International search | [Y]US4653606 (FLANAGAN JAMES L [US]); | [X]US4991687 (OYABA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5359664 (STEUBEN RICHARD [US]); | [Y]US6128395 (DE VRIES GERARD HENDRIK JOSEPH [NL]) |