EP1753498 - FILTER MEDIA AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rubicon Medical Inc. 3598 West 1820 South Salt Lake City UT 84104 / US | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDER, Richard, J. 7810 Chatsworth Court Sandy, UT 84093 / US | 02 /
EDMISTON, Daryl, R. 754 Marsh CV Darper UT 94020 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Steven, W. 7684 South 2250 West West Jordan, UT 84084 / US | 04 /
WOOD, Steven, M. 3189 Gemstone Drive West Jordan, UT 84081 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
LINDER, Richard, J. 7810 Chatsworth Court Sandy, UT 84093 / US | ||
02 /
EDMISTON, Daryl, R. 9425 South Riverside Drive 1811 Sandy, UT 84070 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Steven, W. 7684 South 2250 West West Jordan, UT 84084 / US | |||
04 /
WOOD, Steven, M. 3189 Gemstone Drive West Jordan, UT 84081 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05713558.4 | 10.02.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US04722 | Priority number, date | US20040800522 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 800522 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091813 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1753498 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/012 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/008 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0023 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERMEDIEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/08] | English: | FILTER MEDIA AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2007/08] | French: | CORPS FILTRANT ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002062133 (GILSON PAUL [IE], et al) [I] 6-15,25-30,32-34 * paragraphs [0099] - [0128]; figures 1-13 * * paragraphs [0164] - [0215]; figures 14A-14E *; | [A]US2003187495 (CULLY EDWARD H [US], et al) [A] 6-35* paragraphs [0100] - [0104]; figure 16 *; | [XI]WO2004008504 (TINI ALLOY CO [US]) [X] 16,25-29,31-34 * page 7, line 3 - page 15, line 30; figure 2 * * page 17, lines 8-22; figures 5-6B * * page 21, line 8 - page 22, line 9; figures 14-17 * [I] 17-24,30,35 | International search | [X]US6511496 (HUTER BENJAMIN C [US], et al) |