EP1718466 - FLUID EJECTION DEVICE WITH FEEDBACK CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. Intellectual Property Administration, 20555 SH 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADE, John, M. Hewlett-Packard Company, Legal Dpmt 66-838 16399 W. Bernardo San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | [2007/24] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
WADE, John, M. 16399 W. Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05713699.6 | 16.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US04994 | Priority number, date | US20040789189 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: US 789189 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005092624 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718466 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718466 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
B41J2/04506 (EP,US);
B41J2/04541 (EP,US);
B41J2/04548 (EP,US);
B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDAUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG MIT RÜCKKOPPLUNGSKREIS | [2006/45] | English: | FLUID EJECTION DEVICE WITH FEEDBACK CIRCUIT | [2006/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EJECTION DE FLUIDE A CIRCUIT DE RETROACTION | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 21.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2007 | BE | 12.12.2007 | CH | 12.12.2007 | CY | 12.12.2007 | CZ | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | EE | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | LI | 12.12.2007 | LT | 12.12.2007 | RO | 12.12.2007 | SI | 12.12.2007 | SK | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | LU | 16.02.2008 | IE | 18.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | BG | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | IS | 12.04.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | HU | 13.06.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
LU | 16.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0499373 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 4, line 2 - line 24 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 4 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 55 * * figure - *; | [A]EP1004442 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0034] - [0036] - [0043] - [0047] * * figure - *; | [A]EP1103380 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,9* the whole document * |