EP1765596 - PROCESS FOR MODIFYING THE SURFACE PROFILE OF AN INK SUPPLY CHANNEL IN A PRINTHEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zamtec Limited 61/62 Fitzwilliam Lane Dublin 2 / IE | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Zamtec Limited 8 Fitzwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McReynolds, Darrell LaRue Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 02 /
Silverbrook, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [2013/29] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
McReynolds, Darrell LaRue Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | ||
02 /
Silverbrook, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Keane, Paul Fachtna, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane 2 Dublin / IE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05714324.0 | 31.03.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005AU00455 | Priority number, date | US20040868866 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: US 868866 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123395 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765596 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765596 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1412 (EP,US);
B41J2/1601 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MODIFIZIEREN DES FLÄCHENPROFILS EINES TINTENZUFUHRKANALS IN EINEM DRUCKKOPF | [2007/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR MODIFYING THE SURFACE PROFILE OF AN INK SUPPLY CHANNEL IN A PRINTHEAD | [2007/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DU PROFIL DE SURFACE D'UN CANAL D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE DANS UNE TETE D' IMPRESSION | [2013/13] |
Former [2007/13] | PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DU PROFIL DE SURFACE D'UN CANAL D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE DANS UNE TETE IMPRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 24.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2005 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | LU | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.03.2005 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004012653 (TRUEBA KENNETH E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0038] , [0042] * * figures 2,3,5 * | International search | [X]EP0786345 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [X]US2001024219 (KANDA TORAHIKO [JP], et al); | [X]US2003085960 (KIM IL [KR], et al); | [X]EP0609012 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [X]US6672713 (KOIKE SHUJI [JP], et al); | [X]EP1422063 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US6127278 | US6191043 | US2003085960 | EP0609012 | EP1422063 |