EP1720618 - INFLATABLE SPORT BALL ARRESTING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turcot, Jean-Marc Daniel 240 Clifton Road North Kelowna British Columbia V1V 1N3 / CA | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Anne Mary, et al Anne Ryan & Co 2 Crofton Terrace Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Ryan, Anne Mary, et al c/o Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05714567.4 | 03.03.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005CA00325 | Priority number, date | US20040549168P | 03.03.2004 Original published format: US 549168 P | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084759 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720618 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B63/00, A63B69/36, A63B69/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A63B63/00 (EP,US);
A63B69/3623 (EP,US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARE STRUKTUR ZUM EINFANGEN EINES SPORTBALLS | [2006/46] | English: | INFLATABLE SPORT BALL ARRESTING STRUCTURE | [2006/46] | French: | STRUCTURE GONFLABLE POUR ARRET DE BALLES | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2009 | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2044315 (CURLESS R S & CURLESS S M) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]GB2313322 (ATKINSON GORDON [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9919031 (VIRTUAL SPORTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5720678 (KORTHAUER SUE [US]); | [Y]GB2172509 (SMITH WILLIAM MARTIN); | [Y]US546707 ; | [Y]US5865693 (JOHNSON DEAN A [US]); | [Y]US5269527 (NOVAL CHARLES B [US]); | [L] - "inflatable golf nets", URL: http://www.provisiongolf.co.uk, XP008097717 |