EP1720933 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYMER POWDERS THAT CAN BE EASILY REDISPERSED IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIETSCH, Ines Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 4 67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
PAKUSCH, Joachim Obere Langgasse 30f 67346 Speyer / DE | 03 /
REESE, Oliver Pfalzgrafenstr. 43 67061 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 04 /
SACK, Heinrich Bertha-v.-Suttner-Str.1 67454 Hassloch / DE | [2006/46] | Application number, filing date | 05715388.4 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005EP01675 | Priority number, date | DE20041009739 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004009739 | [2006/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080478 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720933 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720933 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
C08J3/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GUT IN WASSER REDISPERGIERBAREN POLYMERISATPULVERN | [2006/46] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYMER POWDERS THAT CAN BE EASILY REDISPERSED IN WATER | [2006/46] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A FABRIQUER UNE POUDRE POLYMERE CAPABLE DE REDISPERSION DANS L'EAU | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 15.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.08.2007 | CZ | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | EE | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | IE | 22.08.2007 | LT | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | PL | 22.08.2007 | RO | 22.08.2007 | SI | 22.08.2007 | SK | 22.08.2007 | TR | 22.08.2007 | BG | 22.11.2007 | SE | 22.11.2007 | GR | 23.11.2007 | IS | 22.12.2007 | PT | 22.01.2008 | AT | 18.02.2008 | LU | 18.02.2008 | HU | 23.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
AT | 18.02.2008 | ||
LU | 18.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
AT | 18.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
AT | 18.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
AT | 18.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
PL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
LT | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
IS | 22.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 22.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0520182 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1184406 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [AD]DE10140551 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * |