EP1776377 - NOVEL STEROID AGONIST FOR FXR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 421 Hudson Street, Suite 212 New York, NY 10014 / US | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLICCIARI, Roberto Via Rocchi, 60 I-06100 Perugia / IT | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05715596.2 | 28.02.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005EP02086 | Priority number, date | EP20040004408 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04004408 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005082925 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776377 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776377 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, A61K31/56 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
C07J9/005 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/17] | C07J9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUER STEROIDAGONIST FÜR FXR | [2007/17] | English: | NOVEL STEROID AGONIST FOR FXR | [2007/17] | French: | NOUVEAU AGONIST STEROIDAL POUR FXR | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 25.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03080803 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12* claim 7 *; | [A] - R.PELLICCIARI ET AL., "6alpha-Ethyl-Chenodeoxycholic Acid (6-ECDCA), a potent and selective FXR agonist endowed with anticholestatic activity", J.MED.CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, no. 17, pages 3569 - 3572, XP002287455 [A] 1-12 * p.3569 right column Chart 1 and lines 6 and 7 of the text below * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm025529g | [A] - LI-ZHI MI ET AL., "Structural Basis for Bile Acid Binding and Activation of the Nuclear Receptor FXR", MOLECULAR CELL, (2003), vol. 11, pages 1093 - 1100, XP002287456 [A] 1-12 * page 1099, right column, lines 6 to 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(03)00112-6 |