EP1727836 - CATALYST SYSTEM FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESCONI, Luigi Via Palestro, 101 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
MOSCARDI, Gilberto Via Fossato, 26 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
FAIT, Anna Via Palestro, 101 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 05715870.1 | 08.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005EP02479 | Priority number, date | EP20040101020 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101020 | US20040554110P | 17.03.2004 Original published format: US 554110 P | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005095468 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1727836 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F110/08, C08F4/602 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
C08F110/08 (EP,US);
C08F4/00 (KR);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/00 (KR);
C08F4/32 (KR);
C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F110/08, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/03 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/49] | C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSYSTEM FÜR DIE OLEFINPOLYMERISATION | [2006/49] | English: | CATALYST SYSTEM FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFIN | [2006/49] | French: | SYSTEME CATALYSEUR DESTINE A LA POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINE | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2009 | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2010 | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0480390 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-12 * example 14 *; | [XY]WO9818801 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 9-12 * examples 9,10 * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]US5066631 (SANGOKOYA SAMUEL A [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 16 - column 48 * * column 3, line 9 - line 27 *; | [X]US6664208 (FUJITA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 13 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP0172961 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 13 * examples 2,3 *; | [A]US5043515 (SLAUGH LYNN H [US], et al) [A] 1; | [A]US5847177 (SANGOKOYA SAMUEL A [US], et al) [A] 1 |