EP1727442 - EPILATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORBER, Ralf Grenzweg 3 61440 Oberursel / DE | 02 /
GRIESHABER, Frieder Am Belzbecker 16 61267 Neu Anspach / DE | 03 /
SANCHEZ-MARTINEZ, Pedro Erlenweg 1 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Stefan Michael Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Schneider, Stefan Michael Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patentabteilung Frankfurterstrasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05716017.8 | 12.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005EP02669 | Priority number, date | DE20041013755 | 20.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004013755 | [2006/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005092142 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1727442 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727442 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
A45D26/0023 (EP);
A45D26/0019 (EP);
A45D26/0061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EPILATIONSGERÄT | [2006/49] | English: | EPILATOR | [2006/49] | French: | EPILATEUR | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2015 | 16.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2005 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | AT | 12.03.2016 | IE | 12.03.2016 | LU | 12.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GB | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.03.2005 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
AT | 12.03.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
AT | 12.03.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9404116 (MEHL THOMAS L [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13 * page 19, line 28 - line 32; figure 11 * * page 30, line 35 - page 32, line 22; figures 43A-D *; | [X]WO2004016126 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * page 6 - page 14; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0760219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1262117 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0015] , [0023] - [0029]; figures 1-5 * | Examination | JP3120221B | DE19602559 | by applicant | EP0532106 | WO9805234 |