EP1747357 - EXHAUST SYSTEM FOR A DRIVE TRAIN CONSTITUTED BY A TRANSMISSION AND AN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. H.C.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIMERT, Günter Köhlerstrasse 13/1 75323 Bad Wildbad / DE | 02 /
MANN, Harald Hauptstrasse 26 71642 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
MENZEL, Markus Ludowitschiring 5a 76751 Jockgrim / DE | [2007/05] | Application number, filing date | 05716060.8 | 15.03.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005EP02726 | Priority number, date | DE20041022720 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004022720 | [2007/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113956 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747357 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747357 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/18 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
F01N13/18 (EP,US);
F01N13/011 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/05] | F01N7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2016/08] |
Former [2007/33] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABGASANLAGE FÜR EINE DURCH GETRIEBE UND MOTOR GEBILDETE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2007/05] | English: | EXHAUST SYSTEM FOR A DRIVE TRAIN CONSTITUTED BY A TRANSMISSION AND AN ENGINE | [2007/05] | French: | INSTALLATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR UNE UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT FORMEE PAR UNE TRANSMISSION ET UN MOTEUR | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 24.02.2016 | FR | 25.04.2016 | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/39] | SE | 24.02.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5921080 (ULMET VLAD [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 59 - line 65; figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5880413 (WAGNER WAYNE M [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 17 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]US4559776 (ARAI SAKUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6106344 (MASHIKO TETSUYA [JP]) [Y] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US4339919 (JOBLING LANCELOT A, et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE4032431 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG, 8000 MUENCHEN, DE) [DA] 1,6 * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19815705 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE4032431 | DE19815705 |