EP1735261 - METHOD FOR RECOVERY OF ETHYLENE IN A RECIRCULATING GAS PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VINYL ACETATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAFINGER, Willibald Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 1 94133 Röhrnbach / DE | 02 /
HOLL, Peter Salzmannstr. 9 84547 Emmerting / DE | 03 /
KAISER, Wilhelm Wackerstrasse 67 84489 Burghausen / DE | 04 /
GUBA, Jürgen Joseph-von-Eichendorff-Str. 4 84489 Burghausen / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Schuderer, Michael, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Schuderer, Michael, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05716479.0 | 31.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005EP03388 | Priority number, date | DE20041018284 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004018284 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100296 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735261 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735261 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/055, C07C69/15 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
C07C67/055 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/055, C07C69/01 (EP,US);
C07C67/055, C07C69/15 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ETHYLEN-RÜCKGEWINNUNG IN EINEM KREISGASPROZESS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VINYLACETAT | [2006/52] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERY OF ETHYLENE IN A RECIRCULATING GAS PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VINYL ACETATE | [2006/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'ETHYLENE DANS UN PROCESSUS A GAZ RECYCLE POUR PRODUIRE DE L'ACETATE DE VINYLE | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IE | 13.08.2008 | LT | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | IS | 13.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | AT | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | LU | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
AT | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
AT | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
AT | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
AT | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
IS | 13.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1264377 (JOSEFPH LEE RUSSELL) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 18 * * page 3, line 62 - line 71 * * page 5, line 16 - line 100; figure 1 *; | [DA]US3714237 (CALCAGNO B, et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0985657 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0031] , [0034]; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO0190042 (AVENTIS RES & TECH GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 9; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2003060642 (SHAH MINISH MAHENDRA [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] - [0018] - [0037] , [0040]; figure 2 * | by applicant | GB1264377 | US3714237 | WO0100559 | WO0190042 | US2003060642 |