EP1718433 - AEROSTATIC LINEAR GUIDE FOR A POSITIONABLE ARM COMPRISING A FITTING HEAD FOR ELECTRIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHDIANPOUR, Mohammad Heltauer Strasse 39 81829 München / DE | 02 /
BRAND, Jan Bergstrasse 15 81539 München / DE | 03 /
MUTH, Michael Wichernstrasse 12 81737 München / DE | 04 /
SLOTTA, Georg Hirtenweg 40 85375 Neufahrn / DE | [2006/45] | Application number, filing date | 05716631.6 | 07.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005EP50505 | Priority number, date | DE20041006755 | 11.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004006755 | [2006/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077592 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718433 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/38, H05K13/04, F16C29/02 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
B23Q1/38 (EP);
B23Q1/017 (EP);
F16C29/025 (EP);
F16C32/06 (EP);
H05K13/04 (EP);
F16C2322/39 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2007/20] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSTATISCHE LINEARFÜHRUNG FÜR EINEN POSITIONIERARM MIT EINEM BESTÜCKKOPF FÜR ELEKTRISCHE BAUELEMENTE | [2006/45] | English: | AEROSTATIC LINEAR GUIDE FOR A POSITIONABLE ARM COMPRISING A FITTING HEAD FOR ELECTRIC COMPONENTS | [2006/45] | French: | GUIDAGE LINEAIRE AEROSTATIQUE POUR BRAS DE POSITIONNEMENT DOTE D'UNE TETE DE MONTAGE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRIQUES | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61112216 ; | [AD]EP0291119 (N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 48 - line 54 * * column 6, line 24 - line 26 * * column 6, line 34 - line 50 * * column 7, line 8 - line 10 * * column 7, line 14 - line 16 *; | [A]US6150740 (SLOCUM ET AL) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - line 48 * * column 5, line 1 - line 13 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861007), vol. 010, no. 294, Database accession no. (P - 504), & JP61112216 A 19860530 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |