EP1725618 - MIXTURES OF REACTIVE DYES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Klybeckstrasse 200 4057 Basel / CH | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TZIKAS, Athanassios Unterer Rütschetenweg 36 CH-4133 Pratteln / CH | 02 /
ROENTGEN, Georg Pochgasse 13 79104 Freiburg / DE | [2006/48] | Application number, filing date | 05716960.9 | 09.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005EP51037 | Priority number, date | EP20040101142 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101142 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090485 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725618 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725618 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C09B67/0042 (EP,US);
C09B67/00 (KR);
D06P3/666 (US);
C09B62/09 (US);
C09B67/0044 (EP,US);
C09B67/0057 (EP,US);
C09B67/0058 (EP,US);
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
D06P1/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNGEN VON REAKTIONSFARBSTOFFEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2006/48] | English: | MIXTURES OF REACTIVE DYES AND THEIR USE | [2006/48] | French: | MELANGE DE COLORANTS REACTIFS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2005 | AT | 27.07.2011 | BE | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | LT | 27.07.2011 | NL | 27.07.2011 | PL | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SE | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | IS | 27.11.2011 | GB | 09.03.2012 | IE | 09.03.2012 | LU | 09.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
GB | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
LU | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
GB | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
GB | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
GB | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 27.07.2011 | |
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4257770 (NISHIMURA NOBUZI, et al) [Y] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [Y]DE4142766 (BAYER AG) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0730010 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0735111 (DYSTAR TEXTILFARBEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0905201 (BEZEMA AG [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 * |