EP1726186 - EQUIPMENT FOR FITTING A HEARING AID TO THE SPECIFIC NEEDS OF A HEARING IMPAIRED INDIVIDUAL AND SOFTWARE FOR USE IN A FITTING EQUIPMENT FOR FITTING A HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTICON A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smo̸rum / DK | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, Mark c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smo̸rum / DK | 02 /
OLSEN, Jes c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smo̸rum / DK | [2006/48] | Application number, filing date | 05716962.5 | 09.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005EP51041 | Priority number, date | DK20040000394 | 10.03.2004 Original published format: DK 200400394 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005086537 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726186 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726186 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄTE ZUM ANPASSEN EINES HÖRGERÄTS AN DIE SPEZIFISCHEN BEDÜRFNISSE EINES HÖRBEHINDERTEN INDIVIDUUMS UND SOFTWARE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM ANPASSGERÄT ZUM ANPASSEN EINES HÖRGERÄTS | [2006/48] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR FITTING A HEARING AID TO THE SPECIFIC NEEDS OF A HEARING IMPAIRED INDIVIDUAL AND SOFTWARE FOR USE IN A FITTING EQUIPMENT FOR FITTING A HEARING AID | [2006/48] | French: | EQUIPEMENT PERMETTANT D'ADAPTER UN APPAREIL AUDITIF AUX BESOINS SPÉCIFIQUES D'UNE PERSONNE MALENTENDANTE ET LOGICIEL UTILISÉ DANS LEDIT EQUIPEMENT | [2009/51] |
Former [2006/48] | EQUIPEMENT PERMETTANT D'ADAPTER UN APPAREIL AUDITIF AUX BESOINS SPECIFIQUES D'UNE PERSONNE MALENTENDANTE ET LOGICIEL UTILISE DANS LEDIT EQUIPEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2010 | BE | 19.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | IT | 19.05.2010 | LT | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | PL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | ES | 30.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 30.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6574340 (BINDNER JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1-3,5 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 9 *; | [A]EP1351552 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [A] 2,4* abstract *; | [A]EP1359787 (GN RESOUND AS [DK]) [A] 2,4 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *; | [PX]US2004071304 (YANZ JERRY L [US], et al) [PX] 1-4 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * |