EP1725140 - ITEM OF FURNITURE FOR SITTING AND LYING UPON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Staniek, Roland Weinleite 10 96224 Burgkunstadt / DE | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHMENKÜHLER, Werner Pankratiusweg 26 59590 Geseke / DE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Schröter, Martin Patentanwalt Im Tückwinkel 22 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Schröter, Martin Patentanwalt Im Tückwinkel 22 58636 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 05717021.9 | 14.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005EP51134 | Priority number, date | DE20042004300U | 18.03.2004 Original published format: DE 202004004300 U | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005089594 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725140 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47C17/13 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A47C17/134 (EP);
A47C17/213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZ-LIEGEMÖBEL | [2006/48] | English: | ITEM OF FURNITURE FOR SITTING AND LYING UPON | [2006/48] | French: | MEUBLE POUR ASSISE ET COUCHAGE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 28.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE3517944 (ALEMBIK ALFRED) [X] 1,6-8 * page 4, paragraph L * * page 6, paragraph L; figure -; claim 1 * [A] 2-5,9; | [X]DE4426825 (HIMOLLA HIERL GMBH C [DE]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim 2 *; | [DA]DE4433217 (STELLA MOEBELWERK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * figure -; claim 2 *; | [A]EP0504129 (HOPPE KG HODRY METALLFAB [AT]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4433217 |