EP1722803 - EXTRAPALLIAL FLUID OF MOLLUSCS, METHOD OF OBTAINING SAME, FORMULATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE D'INNOVATION ET DE RECHERCHE APPLIQUEE SA;(SIERA SA) 266, avenue Daumesnil 75012 Paris / FR | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Evelyne 23, avenue de la Bourdonnais F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
BOURRAT, Xavier 39, rue de Patay F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | 03 /
ROUSSEAU, Marthe 6, rue du Nivernais F-29200 Brest / FR | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/47] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05717633.1 | 14.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005FR00344 | Priority number, date | FR20040001474 | 13.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0401474 | [2006/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077388 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722803 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/56 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61K35/618 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRAPALLIALE FLÜSSIGKEIT VON MOLLUSKEN; VERFAHREN ZU IHRER GEWINNUNG; FORMULIERUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2006/47] | English: | EXTRAPALLIAL FLUID OF MOLLUSCS, METHOD OF OBTAINING SAME, FORMULATION AND USE THEREOF | [2006/47] | French: | LIQUIDES EXTRAPALLEAUX DE MOLLUSQUES, OBTENTION, FORMULATION ET UTILISATION | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2713482 (CAMPRASSE GEORGES [FR], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 23; claims 1-5 *; | [X]FR2502007 (SIMONIN RENEE [FR]) [X] 1-27 * page 1, line 27 - line 34; claims 1-3 * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 14 *; | [A]FR2743075 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2595247 (SEDERMA SA [FR]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document * |