EP1725215 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CARRIER COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liverpool John Moores University Byrom Street Liverpool L3 3AF / GB | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOZAFARI, Mohammad, Reza Liverpool John Moores University, Byrom Street Liverpool L3 3AF / GB | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | McCall, John Douglas WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool, Merseyside L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05717901.2 | 03.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005GB00825 | Priority number, date | GB20040004993 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0404993 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084641 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725215 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725215 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, B01J13/02 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/1277 (EP);
A61K31/704 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/1647 (EP);
B01F33/402 (EP);
B01F33/452 (EP);
B01F35/531 (EP);
B01J13/02 (EP);
B01J19/0093 (EP);
B01J2219/00788 (EP);
B01J2219/00822 (EP);
B01J2219/00831 (EP);
B01J2219/00862 (EP);
B01J2219/00873 (EP);
B01J2219/00889 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRÄGERKOMPLEXEN | [2006/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CARRIER COMPLEXES | [2006/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE COMPLEXES D'EXCIPIENT | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 17.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2007 | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | CZ | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | LT | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | PL | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | SK | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | DE | 26.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | IS | 25.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | HU | 26.01.2008 | IE | 03.03.2008 | LU | 03.03.2008 | FR | 21.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
TR | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
LU | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
LU | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
DE | 26.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 25.07.2007 | |
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 25.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0211647 (ALLERGAN PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-40 * page 2, lines 29-34 *; | [A]JPS63119848 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-40 * abstract *; | [A]EP0753340 (M TECH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-40 * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 2 *; | [A]EP0970982 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-40 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] *; | [A]DE19924643 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-40 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]DE10061656 (NUTRICON UMWELTSCHUTZTECHNIK G [DE]) [A] 1-40* paragraph [0015] * |