EP1730499 - METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF INTRACELLULAR PARAMETERS WITH LUMINESCENT PROTEIN PROBES FOR THE SCREENING OF MOLECULES CAPABLE OF ALTERING SAID PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aequotech S.r.l. Via Saragat 1 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2008/25] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Rizzuto, Rosario Via Crescini 6/ter 35126 Padova / IT | ||
For all designated states Pozzan, Tullio Via Brenta Bassa 73 30031 Dolvo / IT | |||
For all designated states Pinton, Paolo Via L. Da Vinci 12 35132 Padova / IT | |||
For all designated states Brini, Marisa Via Crescini 6/ter 35126 Padova / IT | |||
For all designated states Giorgi, Carlotta Via Roma 113 46037 Roncoferraro / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIZZUTO, Rosario Via San Giovanni di Verdara 43 I-35137 Padova / IT | 02 /
POZZAN, Tullio Via Brenta Bassa 73 I-30031 Dolvo / IT | 03 /
PINTON, Paolo Via L. Da Vinci 12 I-35132 Padova / IT | 04 /
GIORGI, Carlotta Via Roma 113 I-46037 Roncoferraro / IT | [2009/35] |
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
RIZZUTO, Rosario Via San Giovanni di Verdara 43 I-35126 Padova / IT | ||
02 /
POZZAN, Tullio Via Brenta Bassa 73 I-30031 Dolvo / IT | |||
03 /
PINTON, Paolo Via L. Da Vinci 12 I-35132 Padova / IT | |||
04 /
GIORGI, Carlotta Via Roma 113 I-46037 Roncoferraro / IT | |||
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
RIZZUTO, Rosario Via Crescini 6/ter I-35126 Padova / IT | ||
02 /
POZZAN, Tullio Via Brenta Bassa 73 I-30031 Dolvo / IT | |||
03 /
PINTON, Paolo Via L. Da Vinci 12 I-35132 Padova / IT | |||
04 /
GIORGI, Carlotta Via Roma 113 I-46037 Roncoferraro / IT | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 05718286.7 | 23.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005IB00795 | Priority number, date | IT2004MI00598 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: IT MI20040598 | [2006/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005093429 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1730499 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1730499 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/52, C07K14/435 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
G01N33/6872 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON INTRAZELLULÄREN PARAMETERN MIT LUMINESZIERENDEN PROTEINSONDEN ZUR SELEKTION VON MOLEKÜLEN, DIE DIESE PARAMETER ÄNDERN KÖNNEN | [2006/50] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF INTRACELLULAR PARAMETERS WITH LUMINESCENT PROTEIN PROBES FOR THE SCREENING OF MOLECULES CAPABLE OF ALTERING SAID PARAMETERS | [2006/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE PARAMETRES INTRACELLULAIRES AU MOYEN DE SONDES PROTEIQUES LUMINESCENTES POUR LE CRIBLAGE DE MOLECULES CAPABLES DE MODIFIER LESDITS PARAMETRES | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2005 | Translation filed | 24.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | IE | 23.03.2010 | LU | 23.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2016/06] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
TR | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
IE | 23.03.2010 | ||
LU | 23.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
IE | 23.03.2010 | ||
LU | 23.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
IE | 23.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6566083 (THASTRUP OLE [DK], et al); | [X]WO03082904 (CHEMICON INTERNAT INC [US]) [X] 1-5,31,32,43-46 * figure 1; claims 66-95 *; | [X] - TORFS HERBERT ET AL, "Recombinant aequorin as a reporter for receptor-mediated changes of intracellular Ca2+-levels in Drosophila S2 cells", INVERTEBRATE NEUROSCIENCE, (200204), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1354-2516, pages 119 - 124, XP002348989 [X] 1-5,21,31,32,43-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10158-001-0013-2 | [X] - LE POUL EMMANUEL ET AL, "Adaptation of aequorin functional assay to high throughput screening", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING, (200202), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1087-0571, pages 57 - 65, XP009055395 [X] 1-5,21,31,32,43-46 * the whole document * | [X] - BRINI M ET AL, "Nuclear targeting of aequorin: A new approach for measuring nuclear Ca-2+ concentration in intact cells", CELL CALCIUM, (1994), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0143-4160, pages 259 - 268, XP009055350 [X] 31-34,42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0143-4160(94)90089-2 | [X] - CHIESA A ET AL, "RECOMBINANT AEQUORIN AND GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN AS VALUABLE TOOLS IN THE STUDY OF CELL SIGNALLING", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20010401), vol. 355, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 1 - 12, XP009013205 [X] 31,32,43 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3550001 |