EP1738506 - METHOD FOR STORING BROADCAST CONTENTS, AND A BROADCAST CONTENT STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Pace Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/45] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Pace Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB | |||
Former [2008/44] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Pace MicroTechnology PLC Victoria Road Saltaire, Shipley West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB | |||
Former [2007/01] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THELEN, Eric Philips Int. Pty. & Strds. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
KLAKOW, Dietrich Philips Int. Pty. & Strds. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05718642.1 | 06.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005IB51125 | Priority number, date | EP20040101534 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04101534 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005101708 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1738506 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04H9/00, H04N5/76 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H04H60/73 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04N5/782 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2516 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN VON AUSGESTRAHLTEN INHALTEN UND AUSSTRAHLUNGSINHALTS-SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2007/01] | English: | METHOD FOR STORING BROADCAST CONTENTS, AND A BROADCAST CONTENT STORAGE SYSTEM | [2007/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE STOCKAGE DE CONTENUS DE DIFFUSION ET SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE DE CONTENU DE DIFFUSION | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 31.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2258102 (ROYAL COLLEGE OF ART [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,7-12 * page 2, line 10 - line 15 * * page 4, line 17 - line 24 * * page 7, line 17 - line 24 * * page 13, line 12 - line 14; claim 6 * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 1 * * page 13, line 14 - line 17 * * page 17, line 14 - page 20, line 20 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 14 *; | [A]US2003163823 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 6* page 1, paragraph 5 * |