EP1732293 - RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, FIXED INFORMATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuoka, Shinya, c/o Corporate R&D Laboratory of Pioneer Corporation, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 3502288 / JP | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05719546.3 | 25.02.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP03145 | Priority number, date | JP20040096006 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004096006 | [2006/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005094046 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1732293 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/10, H04B7/26, H04M1/00, H04M1/02, H04M1/725, B60R11/02, H04M1/04 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
H04M1/6075 (EP,US);
B60R11/02 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0052 (EP,US);
B60R2011/007 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0078 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0282 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | H04M1/10, H04B7/26, H04M1/00, H04M1/02, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2006/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNK SYSTEM, STATIONÄRE INFORMATIONSEINRICHTUNG, UND MOBILE ENDEINRICHTUNG | [2006/50] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, FIXED INFORMATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE | [2006/50] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO, DISPOSITIF D'INFORMATION FIXE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL MOBILE | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2006 | Translation filed | 25.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/05] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH09162959 (TAMURA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [YA]US6122528 (GARCIA JORGE L [US], et al); | [A]GB2358991 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | International search | [A]JPH07192102 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JPH08278929 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2000038092 (NISSAN MOTOR) |