EP1721604 - STABLE CAPSULE PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540-08645 / JP | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAHARA, N.; c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Hiroki 7-D-304, Kamiyamada, Suita-shi Osaka 5650872 / JP | 03 /
NONOMURA, M.; c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5328686 / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05719925.9 | 03.03.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005JP03621 | Priority number, date | JP20040060613 | 04.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004060613 | [2006/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084649 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721604 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K9/58, A61K31/4439, A61K45/00, A61K47/34, A61K47/42, A61P1/04, C07D401/12 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,US);
A61K9/4816 (EP,US);
A61K9/4825 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/46] | A61K9/48, A61K9/58, A61K31/4439, A61K45/00, A61K47/34, A61K47/42, A61P1/04, // C07D401/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILES KAPSELPRÄPARAT | [2006/46] | English: | STABLE CAPSULE PREPARATION | [2006/46] | French: | PREPARATION DE CAPSULE STABLE | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2006 | Translation filed | 30.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0237200 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4786505 (LOVGREN KURT I [SE], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0496437 (HAESSLE AB [SE]) [X] 1,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9903453 (LEK TOVARNA FARMACEVTSKIH [SI], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-12,14-24 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraphs 1-4 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 11, paragraphs 2-4 * * examples 1-13 *; | [X]EP1136070 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6* the whole document *; | [X]WO0239980 (LEK TOVARNA FARMACEVTSKIH [SI], et al) [X] 1,7,10,11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]CA2463690 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-24 * page 1, lines 10-18 * * page 2, lines 5-17 * * page 3, lines 15-25 * * page 4, lines 15-25 * * page 5, lines 1-13 * * page 6, lines 1-15 * * page 7, lines 16-25 * * page 9, lines 8-25 * * page 10, lines 1-15 * * page 19, lines 19-25 * * page 23, lines 19-25 * * page 24 * * page 25, lines 10-25 * * page 27, lines 6-20 * * page 29, lines 11-18 * * page 31, lines 18-25 * * page 32, lines 1-15 * * examples 1-8 * | International search | [X]JPH0380930 (NIPPON ELANCO); | [X]JPH0565222 (FUJI CAPSULE KK); | [X]JPH0672862 (NIPPON ELANCO); | [X]JPH06157915 (WARNER LAMBERT KK); | [X]JP2000202003 (SHIONOGI QUALICAPS KK); | [Y]JP2000212085 (NANKO KAGAKU SEIYAKU KOFUN YUG); | [Y]JP2000514051 ; | [X]WO02088246 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP], et al); | [X]JP2003505565 ; | [Y]WO03032953 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003520225 ; | [X]JP2003313125 (CAPSUGEL JAPAN INC); | [X]JP2003313120 (FANCL CORP) |