EP1724180 - RACK GUIDE AND RACK AND PINION STEERING DEVICE USING THE RACK GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 30-5, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8584 / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 30-5, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8584 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Shuichi, c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant, 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | 02 /
KUZUMI, Yoshiro, c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant, 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | 03 /
KAIDA, Hidetoshi, c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant, 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05720066.9 | 04.03.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005JP03794 | Priority number, date | JP20040066369 | 09.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004066369 | JP20040261540 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004261540 | [2006/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085039 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724180 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724180 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D3/12 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F16H55/283 (EP,US);
B62D3/12 (KR);
B62D3/02 (KR);
B62D3/123 (EP,US);
B62D5/22 (KR);
Y10T74/18768 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/24] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNSTANGENFÜHRUNG UND DIE ZAHNSTANGENFÜHRUNG VERWENDENDE ZAHNSTANGENTRIEB-LENKVORRICHTUNG | [2006/47] | English: | RACK GUIDE AND RACK AND PINION STEERING DEVICE USING THE RACK GUIDE | [2006/47] | French: | GUIDE DE CRÉMAILLÈRE ET CRÉMAILLÈRE ET DISPOSITIF DE LEVIER DE DIRECTION UTILISANT LE GUIDE DE CRÉMAILLÈRE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2006 | Translation filed | 18.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3724136 (JIDOSHA KIKI CO [JP]) [A] 16,18,19,21-23* the whole document *; | [A]JPH0265674U (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH0867259 (KOYO SEIKO CO, et al) [Y] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE19811917 (ARDEPA [FR]) [X] 1-7,11,12,18-20 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15,21-23; | [XAY]WO03097427 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12,16 * the whole document * [A] 17,20 [Y] 21-23; | [E]FR2859439 (KOYO STEERING EUROPE KSE [FR]) [E] 1-3,11,12,18,19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS519431U ; | [X]JPS60130175U ; | [Y]JPS57159056U ; | [Y]JPH0867259 (KOYO SEIKO CO, et al); | [Y]JPH0265674U ; | [Y]JPS5819874U ; | [Y]JPH01173074U | by applicant | JPS5819873 |