EP1726247 - ENDOSCOPE INSERTION AIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/48] | ENDOSCOPE INSERTION AUXILIARY DEVICE | ||
[2011/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Shinsuke c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 02 /
TAKIZAWA, Hironobu c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 03 /
AOKI, Isao c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 04 /
KAWANO, Hironao c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
TANAKA, Shinsuke c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKIZAWA, Hironobu c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | |||
03 /
AOKI, Isao c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | |||
04 /
KAWANO, Hironao c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720564.3 | 11.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005JP04293 | Priority number, date | JP20040073581 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004073581 | JP20040111521 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004111521 | JP20040219214 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004219214 | [2006/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087082 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726247 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726247 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A61B1/01 (EP,US);
A61B1/00073 (EP,US);
A61B1/00075 (EP,US);
A61B1/00082 (EP,US);
A61B1/00133 (EP,US);
A61B1/0014 (EP,US);
A61B1/00148 (EP);
A61B1/00158 (EP,US);
A61B1/0016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/25] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ENDOSKOP-EINFÜHRUNG | [2006/48] | English: | ENDOSCOPE INSERTION AIDING DEVICE | [2011/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUXILIAIRE D'INSERTION D'ENDOSCOPE | [2006/48] |
Former [2006/48] | ENDOSCOPE INSERTION AUXILIARY DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2006 | Translation filed | 06.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2013/10] |
Former [2013/07] | FR | 02.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02141657 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,3,7-9,11,12,30-34,39,47,49 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH10155733 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JPH0779909 (TERUMO CORP); | [Y]JP2003210392 (PENTAX CORP, et al); | [A]JP2002507922 ; | [A]JP2003260026 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPH11128230 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) | by applicant | JPH02141657 | JPH10155733 | JPH0779909 | JP2003210392 |