EP1734493 - PADDING APPLICATION METHOD TO ENSURE THE SECURITY OF THE NTRU ENCRYPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/51] | PADDING APPLICATION METHOD GUARANTEEING SAFETY OF ENCRYPTION METHOD | ||
[2013/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/48] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERANISI, Isamu, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/48] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
TERANISI, Isamu, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Robson, Aidan John, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/45] | Robson, Aidan John, et al Reddie & Grose 16-18 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Robson, Aidan John, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/07] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward, et al 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/51] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05721337.3 | 23.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005JP05287 | Priority number, date | JP20040102399 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004102399 | [2006/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005098796 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734493 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1734493 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/30 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
H04L9/3093 (EP,US);
H04L2209/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | G09C1/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STOPFANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN, DAS DIE SICHERHEIT DES NTRU-VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHRENS GARANTIERT | [2013/26] | English: | PADDING APPLICATION METHOD TO ENSURE THE SECURITY OF THE NTRU ENCRYPTION | [2013/26] | French: | MÉTHODE D'APPLICATION DE BOURRAGE ASSURANT LA SÉCURITÉ DU CHIFFREMENT NTRU | [2013/26] |
Former [2006/51] | STOPFANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN, DAS DIE SICHERHEIT EINES VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHRENS GARANTIERT | ||
Former [2006/51] | PADDING APPLICATION METHOD GUARANTEEING SAFETY OF ENCRYPTION METHOD | ||
Former [2006/51] | MÉTHODE D"APPLICATION DE BOURRAGE GARANTISSANT LA SÛRETÉ D"UNE MÉTHODE DE CRYPTAGE | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2005 | Translation filed | 19.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.05.2013 | 21.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002018560 (LAUTER KRISTIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] *; | [I]EP1249963 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0054] and [0067] * * paragraph [0155] *; | [I]EP1304829 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0074]; figure 2a *; | [A] - SHOUP V ED - PRENEEL B (ED), "USING HASH FUNCTIONS AS A HEDGE AGAINST CHOSEN CIPHERTEXT ATTACK", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - EUROCRYPT 2000. INTERNATIONAL CONF. ON THE THEORY AND APPLICATION OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC TECHNIQUES. BRUGES, BE, MAY 14 20000514 SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20000514), VOL. 1807, ISBN 978-3-540-67517-4, pages 275 - 288, XP000896063 [A] 8,12,16,18-20 * paragraph [04.2] * | International search | [A]JP2000516733 | [A] - SHOUP V. ET AL, "OAEP Reconsidered (Entended Abstract)", LNCS., (2001), vol. 2139, pages 239 - 259, XP000988705 | [A] - NGUYEN P.Q. AND POINTCHEVAL D. ET AL, "Analysis and Improvements of NTRU Encryption Paddings.", LNCS., (2002), vol. 2442, pages 210 - 225, XP002989876 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45708-9_14 | by applicant | EP1304829 | EP1249963 |