EP1709695 - GALLIUM NITRIDE-BASED III-V GROUP COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd 65-12, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry- Foundation Hyoja-Dong, Nam-Gu Pohang-Si, Gyeongsangbuk-Do, 790-784 / KR | [2018/52] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd 65-12, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry- Foundation Hyoja-Dong, Nam-Gu Pohang-Si, Gyeongsangbuk-Do, 790-784 / KR | |||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Seoul Opto-Device Co., Ltd. 1 Block 36, 725-5 Wonsi-Dong, Danwon-Gu Ansan 425-851 / KR | ||
For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry Foundation Hyoja-Dong, Nam-Gu Pohang-Si, Gyeongsangbuk-Do, 790-784 / KR | |||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Seoul Opto-Device Co., Ltd. 1 Block 36, 725-5 Wonsi-Dong, Danwon-Gu Ansan 425-851 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jong-Lam E-1401, Professor Dormitory 756, Jigok-Dong Nam-Gu, Pohang 790-390 / KR | [2018/52] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
LEE, Jong-Lam E-1401, Professor Dormitory 756, Jigok-Dong Nam-Gu, Pohang 790-390 / KR | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/36] | Stolmár, Matthias, et al Stolmár & Partner Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Scheele, Friedrich Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Stolmár, Matthias Stolmár Scheele Hinkelmann Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Michalski, Stefan Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Michalski, Stefan Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05721806.7 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005KR00150 | Priority number, date | KR20040002849 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: KR 2004002849 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069389 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1709695 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1709695 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/285, H01L33/32, H01L33/40 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H01L33/405 (EP,US);
B65G65/38 (KR);
H01L21/28575 (EP,US);
B65G2201/04 (KR);
B65G2207/48 (KR);
B65G2814/0326 (KR);
H01L33/32 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/41] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/52] |
Former [2007/16] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF GALLIUMNITRID BASIERENDE GRUPPEN-III-V-VERBUNDHALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/27] | English: | GALLIUM NITRIDE-BASED III-V GROUP COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2006/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DE COMPOSES DES GROUPES III-V A BASE DE NITRURE DE GALLIUM ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2018/27] |
Former [2006/41] | AUF GALLIUMNITRID BASIERENDE III-V-GRUPPEN-VERBUNDHALBLEITEREINRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2006/41] | DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DE COMPOSES DES GROUPES III-V A BASE DE NITRURE DE GALLIUM ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.02.2011 | 16.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.02.2019 | GB | 26.03.2019 | [2020/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0926744 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0031] * [Y] 2-5,7; | [XY]WO0147038 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 20 *[Y] 2-5,7; | [X]EP1168460 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0072] - [0104] * | International search | [A]JP2000294837 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH1140846 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2000036619 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]WO02099901 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al) | Examination | US2003141506 |