EP1725394 - LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corus Technology BV P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA Ijmuiden / NL | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGCHERT, Albertus, Johannes, Maria Wulverderlaan 9 NL-2071 BG Santpoort-Noord / NL | 02 /
DE WIT, Justus Gerrit Doustraat 15 NL-2311 XM Leiden / NL | 03 /
KLEEMANS, Carel Pieter Hogewerf 98 1082 NG Amsterdam / NL | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Kruit, Jan, et al Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Kruit, Jan, et al Corus Technology BV Corus Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | ||
Former [2006/48] | Kruit, Jan, et al Corus Technology BV PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 05722014.7 | 03.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005NL00158 | Priority number, date | NL20041025620 | 03.03.2004 Original published format: NL 1025620 | [2006/48] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084933 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725394 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/28, E04C2/34 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B32B3/28 (EP,US);
B32B15/043 (US);
B32B15/18 (US);
B32B2307/56 (US);
B32B2311/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMINAT | [2006/48] | English: | LAMINATE | [2006/48] | French: | STRATIFIE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2005 | Translation filed | 04.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6080495 (WRIGHT JOHN) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 15 - line 28 * * column 2, line 53 - line 60 * * claim - *; | [A]DE4111629 (SHOWA AIRCRAFT IND) [A] 1-19 * claim - * |