EP1735638 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF MARINE VESSELS AND SIMILAR OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONGSBERG SEATEX AS Pirsenteret 7462 Trondheim / NO | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSSUM, Björn Övre Sverresborg 6 N-7020 Trondheim / NO | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham, NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05722100.4 | 15.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005NO00091 | Priority number, date | NO20040001088 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: NO 20041088 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088343 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735638 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735638 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/82, G01S13/87, G05D1/02 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
G01S13/876 (EP,US);
G01S13/82 (EP,US);
G01S7/4056 (EP,US);
G01S7/4091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION VON SEEFAHRZEUGEN UND ANDEREN OBJEKTEN | [2006/52] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF MARINE VESSELS AND SIMILAR OBJECTS | [2006/52] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA POSITION DE BATIMENTS DE MER ET D'OBJETS SIMILAIRES | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | LT | 29.10.2008 | PL | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | IS | 28.02.2009 | IE | 15.03.2009 | LU | 15.03.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
LU | 15.03.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
LU | 15.03.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 29.10.2008 | |
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1313928 (DECCA LTD); | [Y]US4292637 (JOHNSON HENRY C); | [A]US4464662 (TOMASI JEAN-PIERRE [FR]); | [A]US6084530 (PIDWERBETSKY ALEX [US], et al) |