EP1732903 - TRIAZOLONE DERIVATIVES AS MMP INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND COPD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2009/08] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Anders AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 02 /
LEPISTÖ, Matti AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | [2006/51] | Application number, filing date | 05722275.4 | 29.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005SE00448 | Priority number, date | SE20040000850 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: SE 0400850 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095362 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1732903 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1732903 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, A61K31/4196, A61P11/06, A61P11/00, C07D213/36, C07C311/50 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C07D249/12 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRIAZOLONDERIVATE ALS MMP-INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA UND COPD | [2006/51] | English: | TRIAZOLONE DERIVATIVES AS MMP INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND COPD | [2006/51] | French: | DERIVES DE LA TRIAZOLONE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA MMP DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME ET DE LA BPCO | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | IE | 29.03.2009 | LU | 29.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 29.03.2009 | ||
LU | 29.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 29.03.2009 | ||
LU | 29.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 29.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 29.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 29.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0726258 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]WO0074679 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1110958 (UCB SA [BE]); | [A]WO0146167 (UCB SA [BE], et al); | [A]WO03078376 (SCHERING CORP [US]); | [A]WO03089429 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [A]WO03092690 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A] - XU Y. ET AL., "Desing and synthesis of a potent and selective triazolone-base", J.MED.CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, pages 5121 - 5124, XP002299289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm034173l | [A] - ROMINE J. ET AL., "4,5-diphenyltriazol-3-ones: openers of large-conductante Ca2+activated potassium (maxi-K) channels.", J.MED.CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 2942 - 2952, XP002989030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm010569q | Examination | - BECKETT R.P.; WHITTAKER M., "Matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors 1998", EXP. OPIN. THER. PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (19980101), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 259 - 282, XP002430631 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.8.3.259 | - WHITTAKER M. ET AL, "DESIGN AND THERAPEUTIC APPLICATION OF MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS", CHEM. REV., ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19990901), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 2735 - 2776, XP000852443 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr9804543 |