EP1735968 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREASING PERCEIVED INTERACTIVITY IN COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKKILA, Tomas Kabelgatan 5A S-972 53 Luleå / SE | 02 /
JÖNSSON, Tomas Ängesbyvägen 123 S-975 98 Luleå / SE | 03 /
SVENSSON, Björn Lundbygatan 36 S-151 46 Södertälje / SE | 04 /
SVANBRO, Krister Skogsbrynet 11 S-975 75 Luleå / SE | 05 /
SVEDBERG, Jonas Lingonstigen 73 S-973 33 Luleå / SE | [2014/20] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
FRANKKILA, Tomas Kabelgatan 5A S-972 53 Lulea / SE | ||
02 /
JÖNSSON, Tomas Ängesbyvägen 123 S-975 98 Lulea / SE | |||
03 /
SVENSSON, Björn Lundbygatan 36 S-151 46 Södertälje / SE | |||
04 /
SVANBRO, Krister Skogsbrynet 11 S-975 75 Lulea / SE | |||
05 /
SVEDBERG, Jonas Lingonstigen 73 S-973 33 Lulea / SE | |||
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
FRANKKILA, Tomas Kabelgatan 5A S-972 53 Lulea / SE | ||
02 /
JÖNSSON, Tomas Ängesbyvägen 123 S-975 98 Lulea / SE | |||
03 /
SVENSSON, Björn Docentvägen 69 S-977 52 Lulea / SE | |||
04 /
SVANBRO, Krister Skogsbrynet 11 S-975 75 Lulea / SE | |||
05 /
SVEDBERG, Jonas Lingonstigen 73 S-973 33 Lulea / SE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05722290.3 | 29.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005SE00465 | Priority number, date | US20040819376 | 07.04.2004 Original published format: US 819376 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005099190 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735968 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735968 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/04 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
G10L21/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERGRÖSSERUNG DER WAHRGENOMMENEN INTERAKTIVITÄT IN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2006/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREASING PERCEIVED INTERACTIVITY IN COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2006/52] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE L'INTERACTIVITE PERÇUE DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2005 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | IT | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | IE | 29.03.2015 | LU | 29.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1202522 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1278353 (AVAYA INC [US]); | [XP]US2004208192 (YOSHIHARA TORU [JP], et al); | [AP]US2004215448 (FUNATSU KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) | Examination | US3723667 | WO9309531 | by applicant | US3723667 | WO9309531 |