EP1755968 - PALLET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GPAC Technology (S) Pte Ltd 14 Ang Mo Kio Street 63 Singapore 569116 / SG | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Teck Tin 259 Arcadia Road 08-03 Singapore 289852 / SG | 02 /
HUI, Tee Jong Block 549, Jurong West Street 42 08-207 Singapore 640549 / SG | 03 /
ONG, Shin Huay Block 651, Senja Link 18-42 Singapore 670651 / SG | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2007/09] | Shackleton, Nicola Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05722357.0 | 01.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005SG00110 | Priority number, date | SG20040003669 | 11.06.2004 Original published format: SG 200403669 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005120967 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755968 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
B29C43/36 (EP,US);
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B65D19/00 (KR);
B65D19/0016 (EP,US);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3255 (EP,US);
B29C2043/5816 (EP,US);
B29C2043/5841 (EP,US);
B29K2105/26 (EP,US);
B29K2311/14 (EP,US);
B29K2995/006 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7178 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00039 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00079 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00318 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00343 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PALETTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/09] | English: | PALLET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2007/09] | French: | PALETTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 14.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3612647 (LIPPENBERGER FRIEDRICH WILHELM) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4960553 (DEBRUINE GORDON R [US], et al) [Y] 34-38 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4305999 (WERZALIT AG & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 52 - line 65 * * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]DE29603642U (VIESSMANN GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 14-33 * page 5, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPH11301670 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 1-38 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]CA2369414 (CANADA KIND CORP [CA]) [A] 1-38* the whole document * | International search | [X]WO0078127 (XYLECO INC [US], et al) | Examination | WO0228617 | EP1321254 | by applicant | JPH11301670B | US4960553 | DE4305999 |