EP1735606 - SIMULTANEOUS CHEMICAL SEPARATION AND SURFACE-ENHANCED RAMAN SPECTRAL DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Real-Time Analyzers, Inc. 87 Church Street East Hartford, CT 06108 / US | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARQUHARSON, Stuart 7 Harkins Lane Meriden, CT 06450 / US | 02 /
MAKSYMIUK, Paul 4 Tumblebrook Drive South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles, et al Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Jackson, Derek Charles, et al Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05722414.9 | 12.01.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005US01007 | Priority number, date | US20040818202 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: US 818202 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005103650 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1735606 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77, G01N21/75, G01N30/02, G01N30/90, B01J20/02, B01L3/00, G01N1/40, G01N30/74, G01N21/65 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
B01J20/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/08 (EP,US);
B01J20/103 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28047 (EP,US);
B01J20/283 (EP,US);
B01J20/284 (EP,US);
B01J20/286 (EP,US);
B01J20/291 (EP,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,US);
B01J20/321 (EP,US);
B01J20/3236 (EP,US);
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
G01N1/40 (EP,US);
G01N21/658 (EP,US);
G01N30/74 (EP,US);
B01J2220/54 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0838 (EP,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G01N30/74, G01N21/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | G01N21/77, G01N21/75, G01N30/02, G01N30/90 | ||
Former IPC [2006/52] | G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE TRENNUNG UND GLEICHZEITIGER OBERFLÄCHENVERSTÄRKTER RAMAN-SPEKTRALNACHWEIS | [2006/52] | English: | SIMULTANEOUS CHEMICAL SEPARATION AND SURFACE-ENHANCED RAMAN SPECTRAL DETECTION | [2006/52] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REALISER SIMULTANEMENT UNE SEPARATION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES ET UNE SPECTROSCOPIE RAMAN PAR EXALTATION DE SURFACE | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 25.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002311008 (SOGA NAOHIRO, et al) [Y] 23-25 * abstract * | [XY] - FARQUHARSON S ET AL, "Simultaneous Chemical Separation and Surface-Enhanced Raman Spectral Detection Using Silver-Doped Sol-Gels", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, THE SOCIETY FOR APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. BALTIMORE, US, (20030101), vol. 57, no. 4, doi:10.1366/00037020360626041, ISSN 0003-7028, pages 479 - 481, XP003008465 [X] 1-11,13-22,26-31,33-36 * the whole document * [Y] 23-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1366/00037020360626041 | [XY] - INSCORE F ET AL, "Characterization of chemical warfare G-agent hydrolysis products by surface-enhanced Raman spectroscopy", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, (20040101), vol. 5585, doi:10.1117/12.580461, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 46 - 52, XP003008466 [X] 1-22,26-39 * the whole document * [Y] 23-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.580461 | International search | [X]US5308495 (AVNIR DAVID [IL], et al); | [X]WO0133189 (ADVANCED FUEL RES INC [US]) | [X] - CABALIN ET AL., "Fast spatially resolved surface-enhanced Raman spectrometry on a silver coated filter paper using charge-coupled device detection", ANAL. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 310, pages 337 - 345, XP002982405 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2670(95)00134-L |