EP1763851 - VENDING MACHINE AND COMPONENT PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandenvendo America, Inc. 10710 Sanden Drive Dallas TX 75238 / US | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Sandenvendo America, Inc. 10710 Sanden Drive Dallas TX 75238 / US | ||
For all designated states Carter, Daniel S. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states Craven, Christopher R. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states El-Aouar, Walid H. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states Greiner, Craig R. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states Hieb, Larry E. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states James, Dean W. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states Southard, Sandra L. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | |||
For all designated states Williams, Rolando S. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno CA 93650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Daniel, S. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 02 /
CRAVEN, Christopher, R. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 03 /
EL-AOUAR, Walid, H. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 04 /
GREINER, Craig, R. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 05 /
HIEB, Larry, E. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 06 /
JAMES, Dean, W. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 07 /
SOUTHARD, Sandra, L. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | 08 /
WILLIAMS, Rolando, S. 7209 North Ingram Avenue Fresno, CA 93650 / US | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05723874.3 | 25.02.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005US06190 | Priority number, date | US20040548321P | 27.02.2004 Original published format: US 548321 P | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005084237 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763851 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/32 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G07F11/32 (EP,US);
G07F11/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | G07F11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/12] | G07F11/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAUFSAUTOMAT UND BESTANDTEILE | [2007/12] | English: | VENDING MACHINE AND COMPONENT PARTS | [2007/12] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE ET PIECES CONSTITUTIVES DE CE DERNIER | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 24.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5201501 (FASSLER GEORGES [FR]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6513677 (SORENSEN STEVEN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003075552 (OHKUBO MASARU [JP]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [AP]US5139384 (TUTTOBENE PHILIP [US]); | [A]US5236103 (FICKEN LEONARD A [US], et al); | [AP]US6415950 (ROBRECHTS JOZEF [BE]); | [AP]US6808082 (OHKUBO MASARU [JP]); | [AP]US7055716 (HOLDWAY JOHN [US], et al) |